Generalleutnant Hans Freiherr von Boineburg-Lengsfeld | (25 Sep 1941 - 16 Nov 1941) |
Generalmajor Heinz-Joachim Werner-Ehrenfeucht | (16 Nov 1941 - 22 Nov 1941) |
Generalleutnant Hans Freiherr von Boineburg-Lengsfeld | (22 Nov 1941- 20 July 1942) |
Generalmajor Erwin Mack | (20 July 1942 - 26 Aug 1942) |
Generalleutnant Hans Freiherr von Boineburg-Lengsfeld | (26 Aug 1942 - 26 Dec 1942) |
General der Panzertruppen Nikolaus von Vormann | (26 Dec 1942 - 25 Oct 1943) |
Generalmajor Ewald Kräber | (25 Oct 1943 - 1 Nov 1943) |
Generalmajor Heinz-Joachim Werner-Ehrenfeucht | (1 Nov 1943 - 18 Nov 1943) |
Generalmajor Ewald Kräber | (18 Nov 1943 - 9 June 1944) |
Generalleutnant Josef von Radowitz | (9 June 1944 - 8 May 1945) |
|
|
Division Staff |
Staff: Staff Company, Signals Platoon, 128th Mapping Detachment. |
|
201st Panzer Regiment (later renumbered 23rd) |
Staff: Signals Platoon, Regimental Band, 1st Panzer Battalion: staff, staff company, 1st Panzer Company, 2nd Panzer Company, 3rd Panzer Company, 4th Panzer Company and Panzer Maintenance Company. 2nd Panzer Battalion: staff, staff company, 1st Panzer Company, 2nd Panzer Company, 3rd Panzer Company, 4th Panzer Company and Panzer Maintenance Company. |
|
126th Panzergrenadier Regiment |
Staff: Staff Company, Regimental Band, Signals Platoon, Panzerjäger Platoon, Motorcycle Platoon.
1st Panzergrenadier Battalion (mounted on tanks): 1st Grenadier Company, 2nd Grenadier Company, 3rd Grenadier Company, Heavy Company (half-tracks): Pioneer Platoon, 1st Panzerjäger Platoon, 2nd Panzerjäger Platoon, Infantry Gun Platoon. Infantry Gun Company (self propelled), Flak Company (self propelled). 2nd Panzergrenadier Battalion (half-tracks): 1st Grenadier Company, 2nd Grenadier Company, 3rd Grenadier Company, Heavy Company (half-tracks): Pioneer Platoon, 1st Panzerjäger Platoon, 2nd Panzerjäger Platoon, Infantry Gun Platoon, Infantry Gun Company (self propelled), Flak Company (self propelled). |
|
128th Panzergrenadier Regiment |
Staff: Staff Company, Regimental Band, Signals Platoon, Panzerjäger Platoon, Motorcycle Platoon.
1st Panzergrenadier Battalion (mounted on tanks): 1st Grenadier Company, 2nd Grenadier Company, 3rd Grenadier Company, Heavy Company (half-tracks): Pioneer Platoon, 1st Panzerjäger Platoon, 2nd Panzerjäger Platoon, Infantry Gun Platoon. Infantry Gun Company (self propelled), Flak Company (self propelled). 2nd Panzergrenadier Battalion (half-tracks): 1st Grenadier Company, 2nd Grenadier Company, 3rd Grenadier Company, Heavy Company (half-tracks): Pioneer Platoon, 1st Panzerjäger Platoon, 2nd Panzerjäger Platoon, Infantry Gun Platoon, Infantry Gun Company (self propelled), Flak Company (self propelled). |
|
128th Panzerjäger Battalion |
1st Panzerjäger Company (towed), 2nd Panzerjäger Company (self-propelled). |
|
23rd Reconnaissance Battalion |
Armored Car Company, Reconnaissance Company (half-track), 1st Motorcycle Company, 2nd Motorcycle Company, Heavy Reconnaissance Company: Pioneer Platoon, 1st Panzerjäger Platoon, 2nd Panzerjäger Platoon, Light Reconnaissance Supply Column. |
|
128th Artillery Regiment |
Staff: Staff Company, Staff Battery.
1st Artillery Battalion: Staff, Staff Battery, 1st battery, 2nd Battery, 3rd Battery, Observation battery. 2nd Artillery Battalion: Staff, Staff Battery, 1st battery, 2nd Battery, 3rd Battery, Observation battery. |
|
278th Flak Battalion |
Staff, Staff Battery, 1st Heavy Flak Battery (towed), 2nd Heavy Flak Battery (towed), Light Flak Battery (towed), Self-Propelled Flak Battery, Light Flak Supply Column. |
|
51st Pioneer Battalion (Engineers) |
Staff, 1st Pioneer Company (half-tracks), 2nd Pioneer Company (mounted on tanks), 3rd Pioneer Company (mounted on tanks), Bridging Company, Pioneer Supply Column. |
|
128th Signals Battalion |
Telephone Company, Radio Company, Light Signals Supply Column. |
|
Supply and Support Units |
|
Army Tactical Reconnaissance Group 41 |
Staff, Staff Flight, 1st squadron, 2nd squadron, 3rd squadron, 4th squadron, 5th squadron, 6th squadron. |